Global Patent Index - EP 1046483 A1

EP 1046483 A1 2000-10-25 - Process for pressing mats into boards for the production of particle boards, fibre boards and other lignocellulosic boards

Title (en)

Process for pressing mats into boards for the production of particle boards, fibre boards and other lignocellulosic boards

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verpressen von Pressgutmatten zu Pressgutplatten im Zuge der Herstellung von Spanplatten, Faserplatten und anderen Holzwerkstoffplatten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le pressage de nattes en panneaux pour la production des panneaux de particules, des panneaux de fibres et autres panneaux lignocellulosiques

Publication

EP 1046483 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108318 A

Priority

DE 19918492 A

Abstract (en)

Pressing a mat of material comprises compressing to a given value (X) and increasing the heat carrier character by a heat fe After a set compression phase, the press gap is increased between the entry plates (8,9) to give a decompression (Y). The materi is advanced between the entry plates to heated press plates (6,7) working at a lower temperature than entry plates, forming a cooling zone. To press a mat of material, to form boards, it is fed into the entry (E) between the press levels and compressed to a given value (X) and the heat carrier character is increased by a heat feed. After a set compression phase, the press gap is increased betwee the entry plates (8,9) to give a decompression (Y). The material is advanced between the entry plates (8,9) to the following hea press plates (6,7) in the main press zone, working at a lower temperature than entry plates (8,9) at the entry (E), and also for cooling zone. The press plates (6,7) have a temperature which is 80-100 degrees C cooler than the entry plates (8,9). The press plates (6,7) are operated to give temperature steps in fields.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um ein Verfahren zum Verpressen von Preßgutmatten im Zuge der Herstellung von Holzwerkstoffplatten in einer kontinuierlichen Presse mit einlaufseitig vorkragenden flexiblen Einlaufplatten (8,9), welche ein Einlaufmaul (E) bilden. Die jeweilige Preßgutmatte wird sofort zu Beginn der Einlaufphase im Einlaufbereich des Einlaufmauls (E) unter beschleunigter Wärmezufuhr schnell und stark komprimiert, und zwar unter Nennmaß komprimiert und anschließend unter Erweiterung des Preßspaltes zur Erzeugung einer Dekompression entlastet. Auf diese Weise wird die Plattenherstellung optimiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/24; B30B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/24 (2006.01); B30B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/24 (2013.01); B30B 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046483 A1 20001025; EP 1046483 B1 20051005; CA 2306576 A1 20001023; CA 2306576 C 20050726; CN 1158170 C 20040721; CN 1274635 A 20001129; DE 19918492 C1 20001026; DE 19918492 C5 20061005; DE 50011275 D1 20060216; US 6439113 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMPELKAMP MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMPELKAMP MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO. KG, 47803 KREFELD, DE

- Document: DE 50011275

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011275

- Representative's name: ANDREJEWSKI - HONKE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011275

- Representative's name: ANDREJEWSKI - HONKE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2008-04-30 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20071223

2006-07-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: METSO PANELBOARD GMBH

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011275 P 20060216

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMPELKAMP MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH & C

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI IT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI