Global Patent Index - EP 1046499 A1

EP 1046499 A1 2000-10-25 - Inking device.

Title (en)

Inking device.

Title (de)

Farbwerk

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'encrage.

Publication

EP 1046499 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107684 A

Priority

DE 29907292 U

Abstract (en)

The inking unit has a device to remove excessive ink, with at least one hood (21) projecting over at least one roll in the u containing the rolls, and with a suction trap device. The hood extends over the entire axial length of the rolls in question (4, 7). The trap device fixed to the hood is air-permeable. The individual parts (22-24) of the hood can be brought to at least two positions.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem Farbwerk od.dgl. überschüssige Druckfarbe od.dgl. zu entfernen, wird eine über die Länge (26) und die Umfangsrichtung beteiligter Walzen (4-11) reichende Haube (21) od.dgl. vorgeschlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/42; B41F 31/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/42 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/20 (2013.01); B41F 13/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907292 U1 19990805; EP 1046499 A1 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI