Global Patent Index - EP 1046501 A1

EP 1046501 A1 2000-10-25 - Device for controlling the position of printing plates on plate cylinders of printing machines

Title (en)

Device for controlling the position of printing plates on plate cylinders of printing machines

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Kontrolle der Lage von Druckplatten auf den Plattenzylinder von Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler la position des plaques d'impression sur cylindres porte-plaques des machines d'impression

Publication

EP 1046501 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107564 A

Priority

DE 29907122 U

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a stop (4) defining the position of the printing plate (1) on the plate cylinder (2) and a transducer (9 that detects the plate position connected to an evaluation unit (10). The transducer is mounted outside the plate cylinder on a suspension fixed with respect to the frame and can be moved to a position enabling a new printing plate to be delivered to the cylinder. An alignment arrangement enables the transducer to be brought into a defined position with respect to the cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Einrichtung zur Kontrolle der Lage von Druckplatten auf dem Plattenzylinder von Druckmaschinen, insbesondere Bogenoffsetdruckmaschinen, mit einem die Position der Druckplatte auf dem Plattenzylinder definierenden Anschlag sowie einem die Lage der Druckplatte erfassenden Signalgeber mit nachgeschalteter Auswerteeinheit. Aufgabe der vorliegenden Erfindung ist es eine solche Einrichtung zur Kontrolle der registergerechten Lage von Druckplatten derartig weiterzubilden, so daß eine störsichere Feststellung der Lage der Druckplatte möglich ist. Erfindungsgemäß gelingt dies dadurch, daß der Signalgeber (9) außerhalb des Plattenzylinders (2) an einer Aufhängung (7) gestellfest gelagert und in einer für das Zuführen einer neuen Druckplatte (1) zum Plattenzylinder (2) vorgesehenen Winkelstellung an den Plattenzylinder (2) anstellbar ist, wobei Ausrichtmittel (6,8) vorgesehen sind, durch welche der Signalgeber (9) in eine definierende Position bezüglich dem Plattenzylinder (2) verbringbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/00; B41F 27/12; B41F 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/00 (2006.01); B41F 27/12 (2006.01); B41F 33/02 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/005 (2013.01); B41F 27/1206 (2013.01); B41F 33/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907122 U1 19990701; AT 363392 T 20070615; DE 50014356 D1 20070712; EP 1046501 A1 20001025; EP 1046501 B1 20070530; JP 2000313101 A 20001114; JP 3380209 B2 20030224

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014356

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50014356

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090407

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014356 P 20070712

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROTHER, MICHAEL

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIERNOT, PETER

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHILD, HELMUT

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLEINSCHMITT, THOMAS

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TENFELDE, JOHANNES

2007-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REINER, FRANZ

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI