Global Patent Index - EP 1046502 A1

EP 1046502 A1 2000-10-25 - Device for controlling the registered positioning of printing plates

Title (en)

Device for controlling the registered positioning of printing plates

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Kontrolle der registerechten Anlage von Druckplatten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle du positionnement repéré des plaques d'impression

Publication

EP 1046502 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107565 A

Priority

DE 29907120 U

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has an attachment device for the front edge of the printing plate (1). The front edge has a stamped-out U-sh aperture (6,7) that can be brought into contact with a stop (4,5) on the plate cylinder. A transducer (8) detects the position o the plate in the attachment device, and detects the front edge outside the region with the aperture and produces a signal if the aperture is at a minimum predefined distance from the stop.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Einrichtung zur Kontrolle der registergerechten Lage von Druckplatten auf dem Plattenzylinder von Druckmaschinen, insbesondere Bogenoffsetdruckmaschinen, mit einer Befestigungsvorrichtung für die Vorderkante der Druckplatte, wobei die Druckplatte an der Vorderkante eine U-förmige Ausstanzung aufweist, welche in Kontakt mit einem am Plattenzylinder angebrachten Anschlag bringbar ist, und einem die Lage der Druckplatte in der Befestigungsvorrichtung erfassenden Signalgeber. Eine derartige Einrichtung soll dahingehend weitergebildet werden, so daß eine einfache und kostengünstige Feststellung der registergerechten Lage möglich ist. Erfindungsgemäß gelingt dies dadurch, daß durch den Signalgeber (8) die Vorderkante der Druckplatte (1) außerhalb der mit dem Anschlag (4, 5) zusammenwirkenden Ausstanzung (6, 7) erfaßbar ist, wobei dem Signalgeber (8) ein Signal entnehmbar ist, wenn die Ausstanzung (6, 7) einen vorgegebenen Mindestabstand (a, b) zum Anschlag (4, 5) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2013.01); B41P 2227/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] EP 0551976 B1 19960703 - KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907120 U1 19990701; AT 363393 T 20070615; DE 50014357 D1 20070712; EP 1046502 A1 20001025; EP 1046502 B1 20070530; JP 2000318134 A 20001121; JP 3370645 B2 20030127

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014357

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50014357

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110407

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 363393 T

- Effective date: 20110407

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014357 P 20070712

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI