Global Patent Index - EP 1046579 A8

EP 1046579 A8 2001-04-04 - A method and a device for wrapping a product in a wrapper of sheet material and respective wrapped product

Title (en)

A method and a device for wrapping a product in a wrapper of sheet material and respective wrapped product

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einwickeln eines Gegenstands in einer blattförmigen Hülle, und eingewickelter Gegenstand

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour envelopper un objet dans une enveloppe sous forme de feuille, et objet enveloppé

Publication

EP 1046579 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 99830242 A

Priority

EP 99830242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046579A1] The method involves shaping a first sheet (1) into a configuration complementary to that of a product so that it houses the product entirely. A second sheet (2) is applied to the product, keeping the sheet flat at least in a respective central region surrounded by the respective peripheral region. The mutually connected homologous peripheral regions are shaped relative to the central portion of the second sheet forming a wrapper portion which is shaped like a case. Independent claims are included for a device for carrying out the method, and a food product wrapped by it, respectively.

[origin: EP1046579A1] The wrapper which surrounds the product (P) is formed from two pieces (1, 2), for example, of thin aluminium foil. The first piece is shaped to a generally cup-shaped configuration so as to house the product (P) substantially completely also leaving a projecting edge (1c) in the region of the mouth portion of the cup-shaped configuration. The second piece (2), which retains a substantially flat configuration, is applied and welded to the projecting edge. The rim formed as a result of the connection of the two pieces (1, 2) is then subjected to a shaping operation against the product (P), conferring on the rim a generally case-like configuration. A case-like housing body with a flat base wall which can support the product (P) is thus formed, the case-like housing body being constituted by an integral part of the wrapper. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/50; B65D 85/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/50 (2006.01); B65B 47/00 (2006.01); B65B 61/24 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); B65D 85/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/005 (2013.01); B65B 11/50 (2013.01); B65B 47/04 (2013.01); B65B 61/24 (2013.01); B65D 85/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046579 A1 20001025; EP 1046579 A8 20010404; EP 1046579 B1 20040317; AR 023589 A1 20020904; AT 261848 T 20040415; AU 2781100 A 20001026; AU 757349 B2 20030220; BR 0002817 A 20010313; CA 2305913 A1 20001023; CZ 20001501 A3 20010411; CZ 302869 B6 20111228; DE 69915589 D1 20040422; DE 69915589 T2 20041230; ES 2214004 T3 20040901; HU 0001597 A2 20011128; HU 0001597 D0 20000628; HU 228169 B1 20130128; JP 2000318760 A 20001121; PL 202342 B1 20090630; PL 339850 A1 20001106; PT 1046579 E 20040531; RU 2242412 C2 20041220; US 6513306 B1 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69915589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: VIA LUGANETTO 3, 6962 LUGANO (CH)

2014-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 261848

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140924

2014-07-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: S.A. *SOREMARTECFINDEL BUSINESS CENTER, COMPLEXE B

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-06-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140613

2014-06-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-06-11 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20140604

2014-05-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140313 AND 20140319

2014-03-20 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20140313

2014-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-02-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2214004

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-05-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-05-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FERRERO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-05-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FERRERO OFFENE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-04-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.P.A.

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FERRERO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FERRERO OFFENE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOREMARTEC S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FERRERO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FERRERO OFFENE HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI