Global Patent Index - EP 1046580 A2

EP 1046580 A2 2000-10-25 - Device for introducing support sheets in packages

Title (en)

Device for introducing support sheets in packages

Title (de)

Anlage zum Einfügen von Traglagen in Verpackungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'introduction de feuilles de support dans des emballages

Publication

EP 1046580 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00201439 A

Priority

IT BZ990018 A

Abstract (en)

The system for inserting a tray (18) of articles into a package has a carriage (7) which carries shafts (8) and can slide al a guide (6). The carriage can be moved to a position where the tops of the shafts protrude between two storage surfaces, contact t tray and lower it into the package.

Abstract (de)

Gemäß der Erfindung ist in einem Gestell (2) ein längs senkrechten Führungen (6) verschiebbarer Schlitten (7) mit Schäften (8) angeordnet, die vom Schlitten (7) mit den freien Enden nach oben ragen und in der Lage sind, Durchbrüche (30) des Bodens (17) einer auf dem Gestell liegende Verpackung zu durchdringen, wobei der Schlitten (7) zwischen einer Stellung, in der die Schäfte (8) desselben vollständig aus dem Boden (17) herausgezogen sind, und einer Stellung verschiebbar ist, in der die Schäfte (8) in der Lage sind, an ihrem oberen Ende eine Traglage (18) zu erfassen, die zwischen zwei Auflageebenenhälften (10, 13) durchgetreten ist, wobei die Traglage (18) sich unter Verschiebung des Schlittens (7) nach unten auf die Innenfläche des Bodens (17) legt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/04; B65B 61/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046580 A2 20001025; EP 1046580 A3 20020828; IT 1310230 B1 20020211; IT BZ990018 A1 20001023

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI