Global Patent Index - EP 1046583 A3

EP 1046583 A3 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for packaging radiators

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for packaging radiators

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Heizkörpern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des radiateurs

Publication

EP 1046583 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106355 A

Priority

DE 19915816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046583A2] The method for packing a rectangular heating device with sheet material comprises first fitting a section over two opposite narrow sides and then on to the narrow sides which are at right-angles to these. The sections of sheet material are folded so th they cover the flat sides of the device and the second section is applied so that it overlaps the first. An Independent claim is included for a device for packing a rectangular heating device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/10; B65B 11/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915816 A1 20001019; EP 1046583 A2 20001025; EP 1046583 A3 20020904; PL 339485 A1 20001009; TR 200000926 A2 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65B 43/10 A, 7B 65B 11/58 B

2002-03-06 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 20011217 NL

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARADON HEATING EUROPE B.V.

2001-05-23 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 20010124 AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLACK KNIGHT BV

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI