Global patent index - EP 1046586 A2

EP 1046586 A2 2000-10-25 - Device for the linear transport of cigarette packs checked on their adhesive-bonding quality

Title (en)

Device for the linear transport of cigarette packs checked on their adhesive-bonding quality

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum linearen Transport von hinsichtlich der Verklebungsqualität geprüften quaderförmigen Zigarettenpackungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport de paquets de cigarettes contrôlés sur leur qualité de collage

Publication

EP 1046586 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107364 A

Priority

DE 19917457 A

Abstract (en)

A conveyer unit transports cigarette packs past a detector which registers faulty glue-joins on the packet. The assembly has lateral inclined guide surfaces (9) directed towards the folded edges.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Erfassung mangelhafter Verklebungen von Packungslaschen an entlang einer linearen Transportbahn transportierten und relativ zu einer Prüfeinrichtung ausgerichteten Zigarettenpackungen. Es ist das Ziel, mangelhafte Verklebungen sichtbar und erfassbar für die Prüfeinrichtung zu machen. Erreicht wird dies durch seitliche, schräggestellte Führungsflächen (9) die eine Linienberührung zu den Faltkanten (6) der zu überprüfenden, abgefalteten Packungslaschen aufweisen. Auf diese Weise wird ein Freiraum zum Aufspringen ungenügend verklebter Packungslaschen erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 57/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/58 (2006.01); B65B 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/28 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19917457 A1 20001019; CN 1270911 A 20001025; EP 1046586 A2 20001025; EP 1046586 A3 20020522; JP 2000313074 A 20001114; PL 339483 A1 20001023; US 6363686 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021026

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI