Global Patent Index - EP 1046587 A2

EP 1046587 A2 2000-10-25 - Packaging machine

Title (en)

Packaging machine

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 1046587 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107730 A

Priority

DE 19918527 A

Abstract (en)

A conveyor device with numerous tong-type pincers (17) to pick up leaflets can insert a leaflet (16) between a product (14) its packaging. Near a delivery device in the conveyor path of the pincers there is a stop (18) causing a pincer to open and rele a leaflet.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verpackungsmaschine weist eine Übergabevorrichtung, mittels der ein Produkt in eine Verpackung einführbar ist, und eine umlaufende Prospekt-Fördervorrichtung auf, die eine Vielzahl von zangenartigen Haltern zur Aufnahme jeweils eines Prospektes besitzt und mit der der Prospekt im Bereich der Übergabevorrichtung zwischen das Produkt und die Verpackung gebracht werden kann, so daß er zusammen mit dem Produkt in die Verpackung eingeführt wird. Im Bereich der Übergabevorrichtung ist im Transportweg der zangenartigen Halter ein Anschlag angeordnet, mittels dessen der Halter zur Freigabe des Prospektes zu öffnen ist. Um einen Halter ohne Öffnung vorbeizuführen, wenn sich keine Verpackung in der Übergabestation befindet, kann der Anschlag aus dem Transportweg der zangenartigen Halter heraus in eine Nicht-Funktionsstellung gebracht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 61/20; B65B 5/04; B65B 35/20; B65B 57/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046587 A2 20001025; EP 1046587 A3 20041215; DE 19918527 A1 20001026; JP 2000318717 A 20001121; US 6354060 B1 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-10-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 61/20 A

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 5/04 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 35/20 B

2004-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 57/06 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI