Global Patent Index - EP 1046591 A2

EP 1046591 A2 2000-10-25 - Bag with reclosable opening

Title (en)

Bag with reclosable opening

Title (de)

Beutel mit wiederverschliessbarer Öffnung

Title (fr)

Sac avec ouverture refermable

Publication

EP 1046591 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108686 A

Priority

DE 29907107 U

Abstract (en)

A re-closable plastics pouch (5) has a rip-strip (7) which may extend along a pre-cut line (6) in the material of the pouch. plastics strip (8) may be located beneath the strip, and may be extended along a fold-line to the inner face (10) of the pouch. system facilitates opening and closing of the pouch.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Beutel mit mindestens einer wiederverschließbaren Öffnung zum Inneren des Beutels, aufweisend mindestens eine längs einer vorzugsweise in sich geschlossenen Stanzlinie vorgestanzte, außenliegende, vorzugsweise streifenförmig ausgebildete Abreißlasche; und mindestens einen unter der Abreißlasche angeordneten Kunststoffstreifen, der von innen außerhalb des Bereichs der Abreißlasche um die Stanzlinie herum mit der Innenseite des Beutels verbunden ist und der mit einem an sich bekannten Wiederverschluß versehen ist, wobei der Beutel als Blockbodenbeutel bzw. Klotzbodenbeutel oder Kreuzbodenbeutel ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/25; B65D 33/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/25 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5844 (2013.01); B65D 33/2533 (2013.01); B65D 33/2583 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907107 U1 20000907; EP 1046591 A2 20001025; EP 1046591 A3 20020320

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB NL

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 33/25 A, 7B 65D 33/34 B, 7B 65D 75/58 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI