Global patent index - EP 1046592 A1

EP 1046592 A1 2000-10-25 - Closure with means for controllably delivering liquids

Title (en)

Closure with means for controllably delivering liquids

Title (de)

Verschluss versehen mit Mitteln zur Flüssigkeitsabgaberegulierung

Title (fr)

Fermeture pourvue de moyens pour régler le débit de liquides

Publication

EP 1046592 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119834 A

Priority

IT MI990844 A

Abstract (en)

The plug comprises an inner cap (3) provided with an upward projecting inner sealing ring (19) ending with a top liquid scraping element (4), defining, on an outside, a funnel top annular element adjoining liquid delivering and recovering conical slots (8).

An improved plug for controllably delivering liquids comprising an inner cap (3), provided with an upwardly projecting inner sealing ring element (19) and ending with a top liquid-scraping element (4), defining on the outside thereof a funnel top ring-like element adjoining with outlet conical slots (8) and for recovering the liquid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046592 A1 20001025; IT 1312092 B1 20020404; IT MI990844 A1 20001023

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030503

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI