Global patent index - EP 1046596 A1

EP 1046596 A1 2000-10-25 - Double walled tank for oil or similar

Title (en)

Double walled tank for oil or similar

Title (de)

Doppelwandiger Tank, insbesondere zurLagerung von Heizöl, Dieselkraftstoff, Schmier- und Hydraulikölen

Title (fr)

Réservoir à double paroi pour huile et analogue

Publication

EP 1046596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106686 A

Priority

DE 19917854 A

Abstract (en)

The double-walled tank for diesel fuel, heating, lubricating or hydraulic oil consists of an inner plastic container (1) wit outer sleeve (2) made of steel sheet. A lid with a U-shaped lip containing a seal fits over the top edge of the sleeve (3). The has bores which fit over supports (7) on the top of the inner container. Sealing rings (15) are fitted over the supports below t lid and a second set of sealing rings (14) is fitted above it.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen doppelwandigen Tank, insbesondere zur Lagerung von Heizöl, Dieselkraftstoff, Schmier- und Hydraulikölen, mit einem Innenbehälter (1) aus Kunststoff und einem Außenbehälter (2) aus Stahlblech, der mit einem Behälterdeckel (6) versehen ist. Der Behälterdeckel (6) enthält Öffnungen für Stutzen (7) des Innenbehälters (1) und weist einen im Querschnitt U-förmigen Kragen (8) auf, der auf den oberen Rand des Behältermantels aufgesetzt und mit dem Behältermantel (3) fest verbunden ist. Der Innenraum des Kragens (8) enthält eine Dichtung, die den Kragen gasdicht gegen den Behältermantel (3) abdichtet. Auf den Stutzen (7) sind Druckringe zur Druckbeaufschlagung von Dichtungen, welche die Stutzen (7) ringförmig umgeben, angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/50; B65D 6/30; B65D 77/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/04 (2006.01); B65D 77/06 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01); B65D 90/02 (2006.01); B65D 90/08 (2006.01); B65D 90/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/503 (2013.01); B65D 7/34 (2013.01); B65D 77/0466 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046596 A1 20001025; EP 1046596 B1 20020731; AT 221503 T 20020815; DE 19917854 A1 20001102; ES 2177488 T3 20021216; US 6206228 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-07-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2005-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050329

2004-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040113

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177488

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000324

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-05

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 221503

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI