Global Patent Index - EP 1046602 A2

EP 1046602 A2 2000-10-25 - Method for the preparation of a splice

Title (en)

Method for the preparation of a splice

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Splice-Vorbereitung

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'une épissure

Publication

EP 1046602 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106378 A

Priority

DE 19918220 A

Abstract (en)

The method for pre-preparing a splice comprises applying a pressure roller (3) to a bale (1) and cutting it across so that t cut ends (6) of the web hang down on either side of the pressure roller. A splice of double-sided adhesive tape(12) is applied t the end of the web (11) on the bale. The cover strip is removed from the top of the tape and the hanging end of the cut web is rolled around the bale and stuck to it

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Splice-Vorbereitung, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß man einen Ballen (1) drehbar in einer Ballenaufnahme (2) lagert und eine Andruckwalze (3) unter oder seitlich von der Ballenaufnahme (2) parallel zur Achse (4) des Ballens (1) mit einem Andrucksystem (5) gegen den Ballen (1) drückt und um die oberen Lagen des Ballens (1) mit einem querverlaufenden Schnitt (A) trennt, worauf die geschnittenen Bahnenden (6 ­ 10) durch die Schwerkraft oder durch leichte Unterstützung links und rechts vom Umfang des Ballens (1) rutschen, so daß sie nun rechts und links von der Andruckwalze (3) herabhängen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/18; B65H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/18 (2006.01); B65H 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46078 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1062 (2013.01); Y10T 156/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046602 A2 20001025; EP 1046602 A3 20020626; EP 1046602 B1 20040602; CA 2303706 A1 20001022; CA 2303706 C 20071009; DE 19918220 A1 20001102; DE 19918220 C2 20021024; ES 2220282 T3 20041216; JP 2000327184 A 20001128; US 6582547 B1 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006651

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100325

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100324

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100324

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100324

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220282 T3

2004-09-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TESA AG

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006651 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEBBEKEN, BERNHARD

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GASSNER, THOMAS

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ASTER, GUENTER

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI