Global Patent Index - EP 1046603 A2

EP 1046603 A2 2000-10-25 - Device for and method of guiding and cutting a supplied yarn during bobbin exchange

Title (en)

Device for and method of guiding and cutting a supplied yarn during bobbin exchange

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Führen und Schneiden eines zulaufenden Fadens beim Spulenwechsel

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour guider et couper un fil arrivant pendant le changement de bobine

Publication

EP 1046603 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108021 A

Priority

DE 19918524 A

Abstract (en)

A bobbin changing arrangement on a winder has a suction nozzle (37) placed behind the driven bobbin (13) and a guide groove on the surface drive roll (29) or on the bobbin (13). At changeover the yarn runs into the suction nozzle (37) and the traverse guide (6) places it between the surface drive roll (29) and the bobbin (13) in the guide groove (48). Independent claims are included for the following: (a) a bobbin changing process where the yarn is placed in the suction nozzle and cut, then allowed to run through the guide groove (48) till the new bobbin has accelerated sufficiently to commence winding; (b) a false twist texturing machine with a bobbin winding arrangement incorporating a guide groove (48) in the surface driv roll (29).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Führen und Schneiden eines kontinuierlich zulaufenden Fadens bei einem Spulenwechsel in einer Aufwickeleinrichtung. Hierbei wird der Faden mittels eines beweglichen Fadenführers im wesentlichen parallel zu einer Spule bzw. zu einer Hülse geführt, die durch eine Treibwalze angetrieben wird. Dem Fadenführer ist eine Absaugeinrichtung nachgeordnet, die aus einem pneumatischen Absauganschluß und einer Schneideinrichtung besteht. Die Absaugeinrichtung wirkt mit einer Übergabeeinrichtung zusammen, um den Faden beim Spulenwechsel zu schneiden und das lose Fadenende des zulaufenden Fadens aufzunehmen. Um beim Spulenwechsel eine schonende Garnbearbeitung zu ermöglichen, ist der Fadenführer im Fadenlauf vor der angetriebenen Hülse und die Absaugeinrichtung hinter der angetriebenen Hülse angeordnet. Zum Fangen und Anwickeln an einer neuen, durch eine Treibwalze angetriebenen Hülse wird der Faden durch eine Fadenführungsnut am Anfang der Treibwalzen oder dem Umfang der Hülse und dem Fadenführer innerhalb des Kontaktbereiches zwischen der Hülse und der Treibwalze geführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/08 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046603 A2 20001025; EP 1046603 A3 20010912; EP 1046603 B1 20040324; EP 1046603 B8 20040714; CN 1232432 C 20051221; CN 1271685 A 20001101; JP 2000327227 A 20001128; JP 4709347 B2 20110622; KR 100669835 B1 20070116; KR 20010066776 A 20010711; TR 200001087 A2 20001121; TR 200001087 A3 20001121; TW 552235 B 20030911; US 6315236 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110419

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070419

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-06-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OBERSTRASS, DETLEV

2004-06-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PYRA, MICHAEL

2004-06-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAMMANN, PETER

2004-05-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005761 P 20040429

2004-04-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 67/04 A, 7B 65H 65/00 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI