Global Patent Index - EP 1046626 A1

EP 1046626 A1 2000-10-25 - Rocket propellant

Title (en)

Rocket propellant

Title (de)

Raketentreibsatz

Title (fr)

Charge propulsive pour fusée

Publication

EP 1046626 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108297 A

Priority

DE 19917672 A

Abstract (en)

Ammonium perchlorate-based fuel for low-smoke rocket propellant is surrounded by an inhibiting insulation layer comprising polyurethane binder and a mixture of 2-8 wt.% silicon carbide, 20-60 wt.% silicon dioxide and 2-20 wt.% heat-resistant carbon, polymer, silicate or ceramic fibers. Low-smoke rocket propellant, especially for end burners, comprises an ammonium perchlorate (AP)-based fuel containing an isocyanate-bonded, hydroxy-terminated polybutadiene binder, in which the fuel is surrounded by an inhibiting insulation layer comprising a polyurethane binder and a filler combination containing 2-8 wt.% silicon carbide, 20-60 wt.% silicon dioxide and 2- wt.% heat-resistant carbon, polymer, silicate or ceramic fibres with a length of 1-20 mm. An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of rocket propellant by homogenizing the fillers and binder in a kneader and then processing the mixture to form the insulating layer by hardening the binder.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Raketentreibsatz mit rauchreduziertem Abbrand, insbesondere für Stirnbrenner, mit einem Treibstoff auf der Basis von Ammoniumperchlorat und mit einem Binder aus isocyanatgebundenem, hydroxyterminiertem Polybutadien und einer den Treibstoff umgebenden, inhibierenden Isolationsschicht besteht letztere aus einem Polyurethan-Binder und einer Füllstoft-Kombination aus 2 bis 8 Gew.% Siliciumcarbid, 20 bis 60 Gew.% Siliciumdioxid und temperaturfesten Kohlenstoff-, Polymer-, Silikat- oder Keramikfasern mit einer Länge von 1 bis 20 mm und einem Gehalt von 2 bis 20 Gew.%. Ferner ist ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Raketentreibsatzes beschrieben.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 45/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 45/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] DE 3643824 A1 19880630 - BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE [DE]
  • [Y] EP 0555008 A2 19930811 - THIOKOL CORP [US]
  • [Y] US 5762746 A 19980609 - HARTWELL JAMES A [US], et al
  • [A] FR 2727402 A1 19960531 - POUDRES & EXPLOSIFS STE NALE [FR]
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 4, 25 January 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 24138a, M. PROEBSTER: "Smokeless combustible insulation for double-basepropellants" page 134; XP002142650 & Int. Jahrestag.- Fraunhofer-Inst. Treib- Explosivst. 1987, 18th(Technol. Energ. Mater.), 40/1-40/14
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 123, no. 26, 25 December 1995, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 344937d, S.B. HASKA ET AL.: "Adhesion properties of liner to propellant and metal in HTPB based systems." page 290; XP000663353 & Int. Annu. Conf. ICT 1995, 26th(Pyrotechnics), 49/1-49/12
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 122, no. 14, 3 April 1995, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 164861v, D.C. GUPTA ET AL.: "HTPB-based polyurethanes for inhibition of composite propellants." page 267; XP000665923 & J. APPL. POLYM. SCI., vol. 55, no. 8, 1995, pages 1151 - 1155J. APPL. POLYM. SCI.199555811511155

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046626 A1 20001025; EP 1046626 B1 20040818; AT 273943 T 20040915; DE 19917672 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FORDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-06-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060414

2006-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060414

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FORDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-04-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-04-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-04-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050407

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-11-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-11-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-11-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-11-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041118

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007431 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2004-08-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-09-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI