Global Patent Index - EP 1046693 A1

EP 1046693 A1 2000-10-25 - Liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal display element

Title (en)

Liquid crystal composition and liquid crystal display element

Title (de)

Flüssigkristallzusammensetzung und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Composition liquide cristalline et dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides

Publication

EP 1046693 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00108013 A

Priority

  • JP 11081799 A
  • JP 16370999 A

Abstract (en)

A liquid crystal composition comprises a component-A and a component-B, each having at least one organofluoro compound. A liquid crystal composition comprises a component-A having at least one compound selected from formulae (I) or (II) and a component-B having at least one compound selected from formulae (III) or (IV); [Image] [Image] [Image] [Image] R1 - R41-10C alkyl or alkoxy, 2-10C alkenyl or alkoxy methyl; A1, A2bond or C2H4; X1 - X9H or F; B1, B2cyclohexylene, trans-1,3-dioxane-2,5-diyl or 1,4-phenylene optionally substituted by 1-4 fluorine; Y1, Y2F, CF3, OCF3, CF2H or Cl; n : 0 or 1. An independent claim is also included for a liquid crystal display element containing the liquid crystal composition.

The present invention provides a liquid crystal composition comprising a component A being at least one compound selected from the group of compounds represented by Formulas (1-1) and (1-2) and a component B beinng at least one compound selected from the group of compounds represented by Formulas (2-1) and (2-2): <CHEM> wherein R1 to R4 each represent independently an alkyl or alkoxy group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms, an alkenyl or alkoxymethyl group having 2 to 10 carbon atoms; A1 and A2 each represent independently a single bond or -C2H4-; X1 to X9 each represent independently H or F; B1 and B2 each represent independently cyclohexylene, trans-1, 3-dioxane-2,5-diyl or 1,4-phenylene in which H in the group may be substituted with F; Y1 and Y2 each represent independently F, CF3, OCF3, CF2H or Cl; and n is 0 or 1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 19/30; C09K 19/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 19/20 (2006.01); C09K 19/30 (2006.01); C09K 19/34 (2006.01); C09K 19/42 (2006.01); G02F 1/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 19/3001 (2013.01); C09K 19/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046693 A1 20001025; EP 1046693 B1 20021120; DE 60000805 D1 20030102; DE 60000805 T2 20030918; JP 2001003051 A 20010109; US 6325949 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JNC CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHISSO CORP., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 60000805

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000805

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000805

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-01-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000805

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-04-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-04-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000805 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI