Global patent index - EP 1046696 A2

EP 1046696 A2 2000-10-25 - A catalytic conversion process for producing isobutane and isoparaffin-enriched gasoline

Title (en)

A catalytic conversion process for producing isobutane and isoparaffin-enriched gasoline

Title (de)

Verfahren zur katalytischen Umwandlung zum Herstellen von mit Isobutan und Isoparaffinen angereichertem Benzin

Title (fr)

Procédé de conversion catalytique pour la production d'essence enrichie en isobutane et en isoparaffines

Publication

EP 1046696 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00108032 A

Priority

  • CN 99105904 A
  • CN 99109193 A

Abstract (en)

A catalytic transform process for reducing the content of olefin in liquefied gas and gasoline features that in the complex reactor composed of lifting tube or lifting tube and fluidized bed, preheated raw oil comes into lifting tube from its lower end and is contacted with catalyst, the oily gas generated after reaction is lifted up to middle or top of lifting tube, where it is in contact with cooled catalyst for continuous reaction, the resultant flowing out after reaction comes into settler, the reaction resultant is separated. The catalyst is divided into two portions after stripped and regenerated, one coming into lower end of lifting tube and another into middle or top of lifting tube. With said process, the butylene in liquefied gas is decreased to 17.5 wt.% and the isobutane in it is increased to 37.04 wt.%, and the olefin in gasoline is decreased to 12.32 wt.% and the isoparaffin in it is increased to 41.83 wt.%.

A process for catalytic conversion of hydrocarbon feedstock to produce isobutane and isoparaffin-enriched gasoline which comprises two different reactions, the preheated feedstock is contacted with hot regenerated catalyst in the lower part of a reactor with the result that catalytic cracking reaction takes place, and the mixture of vapors and the coke deposited catalyst are up-flowed and enter into a suitable reaction environment with the result that isomerization and hydrogen transfer reaction take place. The produced LPG has an isobutane content of about 20wt% to about 40wt% and the produced gasoline contains isoparaffin content of about 30wt% to about 45wt% and olefin content of less than 30wt%. RON and MON of the gasoline are 90 SIMILAR 93 and 80 SIMILAR 84 respectively. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 29/08 (2006.01); C10G 11/04 (2006.01); C10G 11/05 (2006.01); C10G 11/18 (2006.01); C10G 35/095 (2006.01); C10G 63/04 (2006.01); C10L 1/06 (2006.01); C10L 10/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046696 A2 20001025; EP 1046696 A3 20010103; EP 1046696 B1 20140611; JP 2000336374 A 20001205; JP 3996320 B2 20071024

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60048611

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150312

2015-05-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20150312

2015-03-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60048611

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-09-10 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2014-07-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 60048611

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140724

2014-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2014-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2014-01-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: INTG

- Effective date: 20140102

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030911

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: XU, YOUHAO

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZHANG, JIUSHUN

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YANG, YINAN

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LONG, JUN

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WANG, XIEQING

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LI, ZAITING

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZHANG, RUICHI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI