Global Patent Index - EP 1046698 A1

EP 1046698 A1 2000-10-25 - Marine diesel engine lubricating compositions

Title (en)

Marine diesel engine lubricating compositions

Title (de)

Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen zum Schmieren eines Schiffsdieselmotors

Title (fr)

Compositions lubrifiantes pour la lubrification d'un moteur diesel marin

Publication

EP 1046698 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201236 A

Priority

GB 9908771 A

Abstract (en)

A lubricating oil composition comprises a major amount of an oil of lubricating viscosity to which is added a minor amount of an oil soluble ashless dispersant, an oil soluble overbased metal detergent, an oil soluble sulfur and/or phenolic antioxidant and/or aromatic amine anti-oxidant. A lubricating oil composition (I) comprises a major amount of an oil of lubricating viscosity to which is added a minor amount of an oil soluble ashless dispersant, an oil soluble overbased metal detergent, an oil soluble sulfur and/or phenolic antioxidant and/or aromatic amine anti-oxidant. The surfactant system of the metal detergent is derived from at least one or at least two different surfactants (preferably a salicylate). The total base number of the composition is at least 10 (preferably at least 20) and the viscosity index is at least 90 (preferably at least 100, especially at least 105). An independent claim is also included for lubricating a marine diesel engine by supplying (I) to the engine.

A lubricating oil composition for a marine diesel engine comprises a major amount of an oil of lubricating viscosity and minor amounts of (a) an oil-soluble ashless dispersant (b) an oil-soluble overbased metal detergent whose surfactant system is derived from one or more surfactants, said one surfactant being a salicylate, such as at least two different surfactants; and (c1) a first oil-soluble anti-oxidant being sulfur-containing or phenolic or both, and/or (c2) an oil-soluble aromatic amine anti-oxidant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 163/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 129/10 (2006.01); C10M 133/12 (2006.01); C10M 135/02 (2006.01); C10M 135/20 (2006.01); C10M 135/36 (2006.01); C10M 159/20 (2006.01); C10M 159/22 (2006.01); C10M 159/24 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 20/00 (2006.01); C10N 20/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/042 (2013.01); C10M 2207/26 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/24 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/083 (2013.01); C10M 2219/086 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 163/00 + C10M 129/18 + C10M 133/12 + C10M 133/52 + C10M 135/04 + C10M 135/06 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/22 + C10M 135/28 + C10M 135/30 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 159/20 + C10M 159/22 + C10M 159/24

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046698 A1 20001025; EP 1046698 B1 20020619; AT 219510 T 20020715; CA 2303660 A1 20001017; CA 2303660 C 20080115; CN 1177915 C 20041201; CN 1270997 A 20001025; DE 60000219 D1 20020725; DE 60000219 T2 20030123; ES 2174795 T3 20021116; GB 9908771 D0 19990609; JP 2000319683 A 20001121; JP 4384784 B2 20091216; SG 77283 A1 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170414

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-04-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-04-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174795 T3

2002-09-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-09-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000219 20020725

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219510 T 20020715

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI