Global Patent Index - EP 1046699 A1

EP 1046699 A1 2000-10-25 - Use of non-toxic, biodegradable functional fluids for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Use of non-toxic, biodegradable functional fluids for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Verwendung von nichttoxischen, biologisch abbaubaren funktionellen Flüssigkeiten für Kraftfahrzuege

Title (fr)

L'utilisation des fluides fonctionnels non toxiques et biodégradables pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1046699 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401044 A

Priority

FR 9904900 A

Abstract (en)

Base fluids which are non-toxic and biodegradable are proposed to fulfill the properties of functional fluids used in automobiles, including engine and gear lubrication, hydraulic oils and coolants, with appropriate biodegradable additives. The use of one base fluid comprising an ethylene oxide(EO)/propylene oxide(PO) copolymer of mean molecular weight 300-1200 an EO/PO ratio of 30-70 to 90-10 for different functional automobile fluids is claimed. One or more non-toxic and biodegradable additives appropriate to the function required, are included. An alternative fluid based on neopolyol fatty esters is also propo An Independent claim is also included for functional fluid compositions based on these materials.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne l'utilisation de copolymères d'oxyde d'éthylène (EO) et d'oxyde de propylène (PO) ou d'esters à chaînes grasses de néopolyols en tant que seul et même fluide de base pour la fabrication de différents fluides fonctionnels de véhicules automobiles par adjonction d'additifs fonctionnels appropriés non toxiques et biodégradables.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04; C10M 171/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/044 (2013.01); C10M 171/00 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/127 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1055 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1095 (2013.01); C10M 2217/041 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2229/02 (2013.01); C10M 2229/04 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10M 2229/042 (2013.01); C10M 2229/043 (2013.01); C10M 2229/044 (2013.01); C10M 2229/045 (2013.01); C10M 2229/046 (2013.01); C10M 2229/047 (2013.01); C10M 2229/048 (2013.01); C10M 2229/05 (2013.01); C10M 2229/051 (2013.01); C10M 2229/052 (2013.01); C10M 2229/053 (2013.01); C10M 2229/054 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 169/044 + C10M 105/38 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 129/42 + C10M 129/76 + C10M 135/04 + C10M 135/06 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 149/14 + C10M 155/02
  2. C10M 169/044 + C10M 107/34 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 129/42 + C10M 129/76 + C10M 135/04 + C10M 135/06 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 149/14 + C10M 155/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046699 A1 20001025; EP 1046699 B1 20080507; DE 60038759 D1 20080619; FR 2792326 A1 20001020; FR 2792326 B1 20070824

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-03-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60038759

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090210

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60038759

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-06-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2005-02-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF NON-TOXIC, BIODEGRADABLE FUNCTIONAL FLUIDS FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI