Global Patent Index - EP 1046703 A1

EP 1046703 A1 2000-10-25 - Cleaning or drying compositions based on pentafluorobutane, methylene chloride, methanol and decafluoropentane

Title (en)

Cleaning or drying compositions based on pentafluorobutane, methylene chloride, methanol and decafluoropentane

Title (de)

Reinigungs- oder Trocknungszusammensetzungen auf Basis von Pentafluorbutan, Methylenchlorid, Methanol und Decafluorpentan

Title (fr)

Compositions de nettoyage ou de séchage à base de pentafluorobutane, chlorure de méthyléne, méthanol et décafluoropentane

Publication

EP 1046703 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400777 A

Priority

FR 9905130 A

Abstract (en)

(Quasi) azeotropic compositions to replace CFC and HCFC based compositions for cleaning and degreasing solid surfaces, containing defined proportions of 1,1,1,3,3-pentafluorobutane, dichloromethane, methanol and 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-decafluoropentane. Azeotropic or quasi azeotropic compositions comprising: (a) 45-65 (50-60) % 1,1,1,3,3-pentafluorobutane; (b) 30-50 (35-45) % dichloromethane; and (c) 1-10 (2-5) % methanol; (d) 0.1-2 (0.2-1) % 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-decafluoropentane.

Abstract (fr)

Pour remplacer les compositions à base de CFC ou de HCFC dans les applications de nettoyage ou de séchage de surfaces solides (notamment défluxage), l'invention propose des compositions azéotropiques ou quasi azéotropiques à base de 1,1,1,3,3-pentafluorobutane, de dichlorométhane, de méthanol , et de 1,1,1,2,3,4,4,5,5,5-décafluoropentane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 7/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 1/00 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 7/30 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/5081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046703 A1 20001025; EP 1046703 B1 20031015; AU 2894400 A 20001026; AU 764299 B2 20030814; CA 2305019 A1 20001022; DE 60005881 D1 20031120; DE 60005881 T2 20040819; ES 2208232 T3 20040616; FR 2792647 A1 20001027; FR 2792647 B1 20010608; JP 2000328095 A 20001128; US 6291416 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-03-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208232 T3

2004-04-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040401

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040317

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040309

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005881 P 20031120

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI