Global Patent Index - EP 1046718 A1

EP 1046718 A1 2000-10-25 - Purification method for raw beet juice

Title (en)

Purification method for raw beet juice

Title (de)

Reinigungsverfahren für rohen Zuckerrübensaft

Title (fr)

Procédé de purification de jus brut de betterave à sucre

Publication

EP 1046718 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107320 A

Priority

IT GE990043 A

Abstract (en)

Purification of sugar beet juice which can exploit the traditional process, without increasing the use of lime, without increasing the environmental effects due to sludge, with reduced carbon dioxide emissions : A purification method for the raw juice obtained by diffusion from sugar beets, comprises sequential stages of pre-defecation and defecation with calcium oxide, carbonation, filtration, a second carbonation, and additional filtration. Before pre-defecation, a great fraction of the raw juice obtained is taken out, pre-filtered, then passed to a membrane filtration stage. The permeate obtained is mixed to the clear juice of the first carbonation, and the mixture routed to the second filtration.

Purification method for raw juice obtained by diffusion from sugar beets, comprising the stages of pre-defecation and defecation with CaO, first carbonation, filtration, second carbonation and additional filtration; before said pre-defecation stage a great fraction of raw juice obtained by diffusion is taken out, subjected to a pre-filtration stage and subsequently to a stage of membrane filtration, the obtained permeate being mixed to the clear juice of first carbonation and said mixture being prepared for the second carbonation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C13D 3/06; C13D 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C13B 20/06 (2011.01); C13B 20/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 20/06 (2013.01); C13B 20/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046718 A1 20001025; EP 1046718 B1 20021106; AT 227348 T 20021115; DE 60000701 D1 20021212; DE 60000701 T2 20030731; DK 1046718 T3 20021230; ES 2183760 T3 20030401; IT 1311938 B1 20020320; IT GE990043 A1 20001023; IT GE990043 D0 19990421

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ERIDANIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TECNIMONT S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050405

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ERIDANIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TECNIMONT S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2004-05-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040407

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183760 T3

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000701 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227348 T 20021115

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI