Global Patent Index - EP 1046718 B1

EP 1046718 B1 2002-11-06 - Purification method for raw beet juice

Title (en)

Purification method for raw beet juice

Title (de)

Reinigungsverfahren für rohen Zuckerrübensaft

Title (fr)

Procédé de purification de jus brut de betterave à sucre

Publication

EP 1046718 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107320 A

Priority

IT GE990043 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046718A1] Purification of sugar beet juice which can exploit the traditional process, without increasing the use of lime, without increasing the environmental effects due to sludge, with reduced carbon dioxide emissions : A purification method for the raw juice obtained by diffusion from sugar beets, comprises sequential stages of pre-defecation and defecation with calcium oxide, carbonation, filtration, a second carbonation, and additional filtration. Before pre-defecation, a great fraction of the raw juice obtained is taken out, pre-filtered, then passed to a membrane filtration stage. The permeate obtained is mixed to the clear juice of the first carbonation, and the mixture routed to the second filtration.

[origin: EP1046718A1] Purification method for raw juice obtained by diffusion from sugar beets, comprising the stages of pre-defecation and defecation with CaO, first carbonation, filtration, second carbonation and additional filtration; before said pre-defecation stage a great fraction of raw juice obtained by diffusion is taken out, subjected to a pre-filtration stage and subsequently to a stage of membrane filtration, the obtained permeate being mixed to the clear juice of first carbonation and said mixture being prepared for the second carbonation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C13D 3/06; C13D 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C13B 20/06 (2011.01); C13B 20/16 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 20/06 (2013.01); C13B 20/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046718 A1 20001025; EP 1046718 B1 20021106; AT 227348 T 20021115; DE 60000701 D1 20021212; DE 60000701 T2 20030731; DK 1046718 T3 20021230; ES 2183760 T3 20030401; IT 1311938 B1 20020320; IT GE990043 A1 20001023; IT GE990043 D0 19990421

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ERIDANIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TECNIMONT S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050405

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ERIDANIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TECNIMONT S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050404

2004-05-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040407

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183760 T3

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000701 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227348 T 20021115

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI