Global Patent Index - EP 1046725 A1

EP 1046725 A1 2000-10-25 - Spray deposition of metals

Title (en)

Spray deposition of metals

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufsprühen einer Beschichtung aus Metall

Title (fr)

Dépot de métaux par projection

Publication

EP 1046725 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303022 A

Priority

GB 9909268 A

Abstract (en)

Method of removal of a spray cast metal object from a ceramic pattern on which spray cast metal object has been cast comprises dissolving at least a part of the ceramic pattern in an alkali solution. The ceramic pattern is coated with a metal hydroxide powder prior to spray casting of the metal object, and after spray casting the ceramic pattern and the metal object are immersed in a bath of water to allow the metal hydroxide powder to dissolve to form alkali solution. The alkali metal hydroxide is either sodium or potassium.

It is known to remove a ceramic pattern from a spray cast metal shell cast about the ceramic pattern by mechanical breaking up of the ceramic pattern by the use of pneumatic drills. It is not uncommon that damage may be caused to the metal shell by this method requiring that the metal casting be scrapped. A method of removing such a spray cast metal object 6 from a ceramic pattern 8 is disclosed comprising dissolving at least a part of the ceramic pattern 8 in an alkali solution 4. This has as an advantage that the method of the present invention is a much less skilled operation than known methods. It is a further advantage that the risk of damaging the spray cast metal object in performing the method of the present invention is substantially reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046725 A1 20001025; GB 2349393 A 20001101; GB 9909268 D0 19990616

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI