Global Patent Index - EP 1046731 A1

EP 1046731 A1 2000-10-25 - "Carding apparatus, particularly for preparing webs for non-woven fabrics"

Title (en)

"Carding apparatus, particularly for preparing webs for non-woven fabrics"

Title (de)

Kardiervorrichtung, insbesondere zur Vorbereitung von Vliesen für Faserverbundmaterialien

Title (fr)

Appareil de cardage, en particulier pour la préparation de naps pour de produits non-tissé

Publication

EP 1046731 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00108417 A

Priority

IT TO990311 A

Abstract (en)

The carding apparatus comprises the combing cylinders (2,3) which are engaged with final swift (1) at different heights. Upper and lower doffer cylinders (4,4a) supply web respectively to conveyor belts (5,15). The belts are driven by separate variable speed motors through control rollers (6,16,11,19) with peripheral fins. The rollers are arranged at different sections of conveyor belts. Randomizing rollers (22,24) are arranged in between the combing cylinders and doffer cylinders. Finned control rollers are provided to cooperate with randomizing rollers and doffer cylinders. Each finned roller consists of cylindrical tube with spacer rings or helical fins. The finned cylinders are supported in a movable frame which moves between working position and rest position. A regulating roller (13) controls the movement of conveyor belts. The support frame includes longitudinal arms (2) connected to cross arm. The longitudinal arms support to control rollers. The frame is provided with the locking device which consists of pneumatic jacks. Pivoting of each frame is carried out by hydraulic jacks. The regulator which includes support plates in the outer recess, adjust the position of control rollers.

Carding apparatus comprises a final swift (1) with which two output combing cylinders (2, 3) cooperate, the combing cylinders (2, 3) being situated at different heights and picking up an upper web of fibres (V1) and a lower web of fibres (V2), respectively. Each of these webs (V1, V2) is supplied, possibly with the interposition of a randomizer cylinder (22, 24) - to a respective doffer cylinder (4, 4a); the doffer cylinders (4, 4a) deposit the upper web (V1) on an upper conveyor belt (5) having a downwardly-inclined final active portion (5b), and the lower web (V2) on a lower, substantially horizontal conveyor belt (15) on which the upper web (V1) is deposited by the above-mentioned inclined final portion of the upper conveyor in order to form a web (V3) with two superimposed layers. At the critical points of the path of each web (V1, V2, V3) at which - during high-speed operation - an undesired alteration in the orientation of the fibres may occur, there are control cylinders (6, 16, 11, 19, 23, 25) which have closely-packed peripheral sets of fins of limited height and which accompany and control the webs and convey the air-flows produced by the rotating members. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046731 A1 20001025; EP 1046731 B1 20030903; DE 60004916 D1 20031009; DE 60004916 T2 20040722; ES 2204392 T3 20040501; IT 1307247 B1 20011030; IT TO990311 A1 20001020

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160418

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160418

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130419

2014-06-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140610

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FINCARDE S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60004916

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120418

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2204392

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60004916

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FINCARDE S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CARDING APPARATUS, PARTICULARLY FOR PREPARING WEBS FOR NON-WOVEN FABRICS

2001-07-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI