Global Patent Index - EP 1046733 A3

EP 1046733 A3 2001-01-17 - Bobbin for a "two-for one" twister

Title (en)

Bobbin for a "two-for one" twister

Title (de)

Vorlagespule für eine Doppeldrahtspindel

Title (fr)

Bobine pour une broche à double torsion

Publication

EP 1046733 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124591 A

Priority

DE 29907064 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046733A2] The master reel comprises a yarn deflector plate at a distance from the yarn bulb (B). A master reel (8) of the yarn bulb fi between the rear surfaces (11a,11b) of the contour (11c,11d) of the yarn body (11). The yarn bulb is about half of the axial len (L) of a cylindrical contour (11c), and a ball-shaped contour (11d) reaches up to the upper part. The diameter of the cylindrica contour is c. 10-15 mm smaller than that of the yarn bulb, whose height overlaps the spherical contour in an inclined end face.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/10; B65H 54/10; D01H 7/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 55/00 (2006.01); D01H 7/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2013.01); B65H 55/00 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046733 A2 20001025; EP 1046733 A3 20010117; CN 1271031 A 20001025; TW 577944 B 20040301

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030723

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010407

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 01H 1/10 A, 7D 01H 7/86 B, 7B 65H 54/10 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI