Global patent index - EP 1046737 A1

EP 1046737 A1 2000-10-25 - Method of manufacturing airlaid nonwoven fabrics

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing airlaid nonwoven fabrics

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Faservliesen nach dem Airlaidverfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication de nontissés par voie sèche

Publication

EP 1046737 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107105 A

Priority

DE 19918343 A

Abstract (en)

A fibrous felt is prepared using a thermoplastic polymer powder binder comprising a vinylester and/or a (meth)acrylic acid ester. A fibrous felt (I) is prepared by means of an air-lay process, whereby the fibers and the binding agent powder are put down an air stream. The process comprises (A) laying a fibrous felt or fiber to a weight of 10-50 g/m<2> (B) fibers and a thermoplastic polymer powder, based on vinylester and/or (meth)-acrylic acid esters are applied separately or as a mixture in an stream at 10-300 g/m<2> with optional repeating of step (B) until the desired fiber weight is achieved. (C) the fibrous material is consolidated at 80-260 degrees C and optionally at up to 100 bar.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Faservliesen nach dem Airlaidverfahren wobei die Fasern und das pulverförmige Bindemittel in einem Luftstrom abgelegt werden, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß in einem ersten Verfahrensschritt ein Faservlies oder Fasern bis zu einem Flächengewicht von 10 bis 50 g/m<2> ausgelegt werden, im nächsten Schritt Fasern und ein thermoplastisches Polymerpulver auf der Basis von Polymerisaten von einem oder mehreren Monomeren aus der Gruppe der Vinylester und (Meth)-Acrylsäureester getrennt oder als Mischung im Luftstrom in einer Menge von 10 bis 300 g/m<2> abgelegt werden und dieser Schritt gegebenenfalls so oft wiederholt wird, bis das gewünschte Flächengewicht erhalten wird, und das Fasermaterial bei Temperaturen von 80°C bis 260°C und gegebenenfalls bei einem Druck von bis zu 100 bar verfestigt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/587 (2013.01); D04H 1/425 (2013.01); D04H 1/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046737 A1 20001025; EP 1046737 B1 20011114; BR 0001651 A 20001031; CA 2306514 A1 20001022; DE 19918343 A1 20001026; DE 19918343 C2 20010308; US 6458299 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100407

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100406

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20011114

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000036

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-20

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2001-11-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-11-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB IT SE

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI