Global Patent Index - EP 1046739 A2

EP 1046739 A2 2000-10-25 - Method and device for setting tubular fabrics

Title (en)

Method and device for setting tubular fabrics

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Fixieren von Schlauchware

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le fixage des étoffes textiles tubulaires

Publication

EP 1046739 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108503 A

Priority

  • DE 19918147 A
  • US 55258400 A

Abstract (en)

The product is subjected to a heat treatment at 110-250 degrees C directly after discharge from the temple (7,8). The associated installation features at least one temple (7,8) for tubular products (5) outsidee a heat treatment unit (1).

Abstract (de)

Es ist bekannt, Schlauchware zur Stabilisierung mit Sattdampf zu dämpfen. Damit findet aber keine dauerhafte Fixierung der Fasern statt. Diese erfolgt erst bei erheblich höheren Temperaturen, bei denen aber die Fasern Beschädigungen erfahren. Bei einer schnellen Behandlungszeit, wie auf einer Siebtrommel, und bei Verwendung eines Dampf-Luftgemisches kann eine beschädigungsfreie vorteilhafte Fixierung auch von elastischen Fasern bei Temperaturen von z. B. 210 °C durchgeführt werden. Vorteilhaft dabei ist es, wenn die Schlauchware in Umgebungstemperatur ausgebreitet wird und in diesem ausgebreiteten Zustand der Behandlung auf der Siebtrommel ausgesetzt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046739 A2 20001025; EP 1046739 A3 20010523; EP 1046739 B1 20030924; DE 19918147 A1 20001026; US 6458166 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003788 P 20031030

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLEISSNER, GEROLD

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEISSNER GMBH & CO. MASCHINENFABRIK

2002-08-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLEISSNER GMBH & CO. MASCHINENFABRIK

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI