Global Patent Index - EP 1046752 A1

EP 1046752 A1 2000-10-25 - Ground anchor

Title (en)

Ground anchor

Title (de)

Gründungsanker

Title (fr)

Ancre de sol

Publication

EP 1046752 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107806 A

Priority

EP 99107806 A

Abstract (en)

The ground anchor has one or more strands (2-4) which pass over a corresponding number of deflectors (6-8). Each deflector h two reinforcement irons (9a,9b,10a,10b,11a,11b) in a U-shape which disperse part of the forces into the environment and, at the time, act as side guides for the strands. The deflectors (6-8) are metal half-cylinders.

Abstract (de)

Der Gründungsanker besitzt eine oder mehrere Litzen (2, 3, 4), die über eine entsprechende Zahl von Umlenkelementen (6, 7, 8) geführt werden. Jedes Umlenkelement ist mit zwei U-förmig gebogenen Armierungseisen (9a, 9b, 10a, 10b, 11a, 11b) verbunden, die einen Teil der auftretenden Kräfte an die Umgebung abführen und gleichzeitig als seitliche Führungen für die Litzen dienen. Der Gründungsanker ist einfach herzustellen und in der Lage, grosse Kräfte aufzunehmen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/76 (2006.01); E02D 5/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/765 (2013.01); E02D 5/80 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0577421 A1 19940105 - KELLER LTD [GB]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046752 A1 20001025; EP 1046752 B1 20041006

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP WENGER RYFFEL AG

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BBR VT INTERNATIONAL LTD.

- Free text: BBR VT INTERNATIONAL LTD.#BAHNSTRASSE 23#8603 SCHWERZENBACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BBR VT INTERNATIONAL LTD.#BAHNSTRASSE 23#8603 SCHWERZENBACH (CH)

2006-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BBR VT INTERNATIONAL LTD.

- Free text: BBR INTERNATIONAL LTD.#BAHNSTRASSE 23#8603 SCHWERZENBACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BBR VT INTERNATIONAL LTD.#BAHNSTRASSE 23#8603 SCHWERZENBACH (CH)

2005-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BBR INTERNATIONAL LTD.

- Free text: BBR SYSTEMS LTD.#BAHNSTRASSE 23#8603 SCHWERZENBACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BBR INTERNATIONAL LTD.#BAHNSTRASSE 23#8603 SCHWERZENBACH (CH)

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2003-12-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030924

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI