Global Patent Index - EP 1046753 A1

EP 1046753 A1 2000-10-25 - Method and apparatus for forming piles in place

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for forming piles in place

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Ortbetonpfählen im Boden

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la réalisation en place de colonnes

Publication

EP 1046753 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99107303 A

Priority

EP 99107303 A

Abstract (en)

The method draws one or more soil displacing members on a shaft down through a body of soil by turning a screw (34) at the lower end of the shaft. The soil displacing members force soil out of a cylindrical region around the shaft. The cylindrical region is filled with grout to encapsulate and strengthen the shaft. The grout may be fed by gravity from a bath of grout around the shaft. A method is provided for coating the screw portion of a screw pier with grout to protect the screw from the action of corrosive soils and to reinforce helical screws. The fluid grout is forced under pressure into the volume whilst the screw is rotating, by forcing it through a longitudinal channel within the shaft and directing the grout into the volume through apertures in the shaft wall. The soil in the volume is loosened before removal, by repeatedly turning the screw through one or more revolutions and then reversing it. The discs (60,62) are smaller than the screw. An independent claim is given for a screw pier for making a grout encased stepped pile, and also for a drive tool for installing a grout encased screw pier.

A method for making piles apparatus for practising the method of the invention are disclosed. The invention may be used to support the foundation of a structure, such as a building. The method draws one or more soil displacing members (60) on a shaft (32) down through a body of soil (46,48) by turning a screw (34) at the lower end of the shaft (32). The soil displacing members (60) force soil out of a cylindrical region around the shaft (32). The cylindrical region is filled with grout (70) to encapsulate and strengthen the shaft (32). The grout (70) may be fed by gravity from a bath of grout (66) around the shaft (32). The methods of the invention may be used to make stepped piers at much lower cost than existing methods. The invention provides methods for coating the screw portion (34) of a screw pier with grout (70) to protect the screw (34) from the action of corrosive soils (46,48) and to reinforce helical screws (34). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/80; E02D 5/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/56 (2006.01); E02D 5/80 (2006.01); E02D 5/44 (2006.01); E02D 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/801 (2013.01); E02D 5/56 (2013.01); E02D 5/44 (2013.01); E02D 7/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046753 A1 20001025; EP 1046753 B1 20040623; DE 69918265 D1 20040729

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150419

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150419

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-06-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-10-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-09-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-09-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040923

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69918265

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020812

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI