Global Patent Index - EP 1046754 A1

EP 1046754 A1 2000-10-25 - Manhole cover

Title (en)

Manhole cover

Title (de)

Schachtabdeckung

Title (fr)

Couverture de puits

Publication

EP 1046754 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108274 A

Priority

AT 68999 A

Abstract (en)

The shaft cover (10) is fitted to the shaft (12) with a spindle drive (14) which raises and lowers it at the shaft opening. spindle drive (14), anchored at the shaft (12), has an outer sleeve with a rotating spindle within it and a slide moved up and d by the rotating spindle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schachtabdeckung (10) für Gebäude-, Kabel-, Kanal- und sonstige Schächte (12). Erfindungsgemäß ist diese über einen im Schacht (12) verankerbaren Spindelantrieb (14) heb- und senkbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/1418 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19514636 A1 19951026 - VON ROLL AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046754 A1 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030212

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI