Global Patent Index - EP 1046758 A1

EP 1046758 A1 2000-10-25 - Construction method of a slab and a wall-shuttering , prefabricated shuttering element

Title (en)

Construction method of a slab and a wall-shuttering , prefabricated shuttering element

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Platte und einer davon aufgehenden Verbundschalungswand, vorfabriziertes Verbundschalungselement

Title (fr)

Procédé de construction d'une plaque en béton et du coffrage d'un mur, élément de coffrage préfabriqué

Publication

EP 1046758 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810325 A

Priority

EP 99810325 A

Abstract (en)

When prefabricating the shuttering element (19) parts such as edge shuttering (53), cable pipes , heating pipes etc are integrated into the area of the floor or ceiling panel (13) and set in position prior to casting the panel. Connecting the support part such as a wall, support, balustrade etc to the panel is reinforced by reinforcement rods (29) w are inserted in the shuttering element prior to prefabrication of same.

Abstract (de)

Bei vorfabrizierten Verbundschalungselementen (19) werden für das Giessen der darunter vorgesehenen Platte (13) notwendige Teile (29,33) bereits bei der Vorfabrikation in das Verbundschalungselement (19) integriert und die Verbundschalung (19) vor dem Giessen der Platte (13) versetzt. Insbesondere wird die Anschlussbewehrung (29) von Bodenplatte (13) an die darüber aufgehende Wand (11) und die Randabschalung (53) der Bodenplatte (13) in die Verbundschalung (19) für die Wand (11) integriert. Dadurch kann eine Kollision von Anschlussbewehrungen (29) mit Distanzhaltern (23) der Verbundschalungselemente (19) vermieden, Gefahren durch aufstehende Bewehrungstäbe (29) auf der Baustelle reduziert, das Versetzen der Verbundschalung (19) vereinfacht, der Anwendungsbereich von Verbundschalungen (19) auf bewehrte Untergeschosswände erweitert und die Verbindung der Bewehrung (25,27) im Innern benachbarter Elemente vereinfacht sowie der Bauablauf beschleunigt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/161 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046758 A1 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020523

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-07-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: MK PAYMENT 20010125

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI