Global Patent Index - EP 1046759 A1

EP 1046759 A1 2000-10-25 - Anchorage of strands in concrete

Title (en)

Anchorage of strands in concrete

Title (de)

Verankerung für Litzen in Beton

Title (fr)

Ancrage de torons dans du béton

Publication

EP 1046759 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107753 A

Priority

EP 99107753 A

Abstract (en)

The anchor body (3) has in a holder connected to its base plate openings (4) with fastening wedges (13) for the wires (5). T base plate of the anchor body has a shoulder for bearing on the concrete. The base plate extends around the holder which is shap so that the fastening wedges extend from an area above the base plate into an area below same. The base plate is thinner than the holder. The anchor body has ribs extending from the holder to the base plate. The base p and holder can be made from a one-piece metal body.

Abstract (de)

Die Verankerung besitzt einen Ankerkörper (3), in welchem Befestigungskeile (13) zur Aufnahme der Litzen (5) angeordnet sind. Der Ankerkörper (3) besteht aus einer Grundplatte (15), welche eine Schulter (17a,b) zur Auflage auf dem Beton (2) bildet, und aus einem Haltekörper (16) in welchem die Öffnungen (4) für die Befestigungskeile (13) angeordnet sind. Die Grundplatte (15) erstreckt sich wie ein Gurt um den Haltekörper (16) herum und verstärkt diesen, so dass grosse Kräfte aufgenommen werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046759 A1 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030407

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH LI

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI