Global Patent Index - EP 1046761 A3

EP 1046761 A3 2001-05-23 - Frame with a hollow section for a vaulted roof skylight

Title (en)

Frame with a hollow section for a vaulted roof skylight

Title (de)

Hohlprofil-Sprosse eines tonnenförmig gebogenen Lichtbandes einer Dachkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Cadre en profilé creux pour lanterneau de toit voûté

Publication

EP 1046761 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106654 A

Priority

DE 19918632 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046761A2] The hollow section rack (5) has on the inside a reinforcement profile (19) with positive locking engagement round the circumference to connect fixedly to the hollow section rack in areas. The reinforcement profile can be riveted to the rack only in the area of one of the ends. The rivet connection can be in th area of the rack where the latter is curved convex on the outside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/03; E04D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/03 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/032 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0825 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0856 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0881 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046761 A2 20001025; EP 1046761 A3 20010523; DE 19918632 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031201

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI