Global Patent Index - EP 1046762 A2

EP 1046762 A2 2000-10-25 - Supporting element for the frontal fastening of the longitudinal ends of a vaulted roof skylight

Title (en)

Supporting element for the frontal fastening of the longitudinal ends of a vaulted roof skylight

Title (de)

Lagerelement für eine stirnseitige Befestigung der Längsenden eines tonnenförmig gebogenen Lichtbandes einer Dachkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Elément de support pour la fixation frontale des extrémités longitudinales d'un lanterneau de toit voûté

Publication

EP 1046762 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106653 A

Priority

DE 19918631 A

Abstract (en)

The light strip (1) has light permeable curved plates (4) resting on rack (5) with bearing element formed from base profile and swivel mounted angular profile (8) which has a first arm (9) attached to base profile and a second arm (10) projecting there and formed without a contact bearing face which engages round the rack or plates. The second arm of the angular section has openings for passing through screws (15) for fixing the rack on one side and a fr profile (14) for holding the long end of a plate on the other side.

Abstract (de)

Ein Lagerelement (2, 2') für eine stirnseitige Befestigung der Längsenden eines tonnenförmig gebogenen Lichtbandes (1) einer Dachkonstruktion mit wenigstens einem lichtdurchlässigen, auf Sprossen (5, 5') aufliegenden, gebogenen Plattenelement 4 und von oben auf insbesondere den Rändern des Plattenelementes (4) aufliegenden, mit den Sprossen (5, 5') verbundenen Deckschienen (6) sowie das Plattenelement (4) stirnseitig einfassenden, von dem Lagerelement jeweils getragenen Rahmenprofilen (4, 4'), wobei das Lagerelement aus einem auf einer Zarge (3) montierbaren Basisprofil (7) und einem an diesem Basisprofil (7) schwenkbar befestigten Winkelprofil (8) mit einem an das Basisprofil (7) angelenkten ersten Schenkel (9) und einem von diesem abragenden zweiten Schenkel (10) besteht und wobei ferner die Rahmenprofile (14) jeweils lösbar mit dem zweiten Schenkel (10) des Winkelprofils (8) verbunden sind, soll für unterschiedlich große Lichtbänder als Einheitsteil verwendbar sein. Zu diesem Zweck ist es dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der zweite Schenkel (10) ohne eine die Sprossen (5, 5') oder die Plattenelemente (4) hinterschnittartig umgreifende Auflagefläche ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/03 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/032 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0881 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3533144 A1 19870402 - ETERNIT AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046762 A2 20001025; EP 1046762 A3 20010523; DE 19918631 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040126

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 13/03 A, 7E 04D 3/08 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI