Global Patent Index - EP 1046762 A3

EP 1046762 A3 2001-05-23 - Supporting element for the frontal fastening of the longitudinal ends of a vaulted roof skylight

Title (en)

Supporting element for the frontal fastening of the longitudinal ends of a vaulted roof skylight

Title (de)

Lagerelement für eine stirnseitige Befestigung der Längsenden eines tonnenförmig gebogenen Lichtbandes einer Dachkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Elément de support pour la fixation frontale des extrémités longitudinales d'un lanterneau de toit voûté

Publication

EP 1046762 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106653 A

Priority

DE 19918631 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046762A2] The light strip (1) has light permeable curved plates (4) resting on rack (5) with bearing element formed from base profile and swivel mounted angular profile (8) which has a first arm (9) attached to base profile and a second arm (10) projecting there and formed without a contact bearing face which engages round the rack or plates. The second arm of the angular section has openings for passing through screws (15) for fixing the rack on one side and a fr profile (14) for holding the long end of a plate on the other side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/03; E04D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/03 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/032 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0881 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046762 A2 20001025; EP 1046762 A3 20010523; DE 19918631 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040126

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 13/03 A, 7E 04D 3/08 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI