Global Patent Index - EP 1046763 A3

EP 1046763 A3 2000-11-02 - Snow trap element and device

Title (en)

Snow trap element and device

Title (de)

Schneefangelement und -einrichtung

Title (fr)

Elément et dispositif pare-neige

Publication

EP 1046763 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108470 A

Priority

DE 29907252 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046763A2] The snow trap unit (1), for angled roofs with a film covering, has the shape of a small hollow tile or tube stump. Its cross-section surface is parallel to the roof surface, when installed. The shape can also be a triangle, rectangle, cylinder, trapezoid or polygon. The wall (3) of the snow trap (1) has a lower opening (5) for the escape of thawed snow. The trap (1) is welded to the roof covering film by a solution of the snow trap material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907252 U1 19990805; AT 422587 T 20090215; DE 50015546 D1 20090326; EP 1046763 A2 20001025; EP 1046763 A3 20001102; EP 1046763 B1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170430

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170430

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170418

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 422587 T

- Effective date: 20170418

2017-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015546 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: B/S/T GMBH KOCH KUNSTSTOFFTECHNOLOGIE

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOCH, HANS-JUERGEN

2005-10-26 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040903

2005-10-26 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOCH & WERNDL BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI