Global Patent Index - EP 1046763 B1

EP 1046763 B1 2009-02-11 - Snow trap element and device

Title (en)

Snow trap element and device

Title (de)

Schneefangelement und -einrichtung

Title (fr)

Elément et dispositif pare-neige

Publication

EP 1046763 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108470 A

Priority

DE 29907252 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046763A2] The snow trap unit (1), for angled roofs with a film covering, has the shape of a small hollow tile or tube stump. Its cross-section surface is parallel to the roof surface, when installed. The shape can also be a triangle, rectangle, cylinder, trapezoid or polygon. The wall (3) of the snow trap (1) has a lower opening (5) for the escape of thawed snow. The trap (1) is welded to the roof covering film by a solution of the snow trap material.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907252 U1 19990805; AT 422587 T 20090215; DE 50015546 D1 20090326; EP 1046763 A2 20001025; EP 1046763 A3 20001102; EP 1046763 B1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170430

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170430

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170418

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 422587 T

- Effective date: 20170418

2017-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015546 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: B/S/T GMBH KOCH KUNSTSTOFFTECHNOLOGIE

2006-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOCH, HANS-JUERGEN

2005-10-26 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040903

2005-10-26 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOCH & WERNDL BETEILIGUNGS GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI