Global patent index - EP 1046768 A3

EP 1046768 A3 2001-02-07 - Lock cylinder having two driving elements coupled rotatably together

Title (en)

Lock cylinder having two driving elements coupled rotatably together

Title (de)

Schliesszylinder mit zwei Antriebselementen mit Drehkupplung

Title (fr)

Serrure cylindrique avec deux éléments d'entraînement avec couplage rotatif

Publication

EP 1046768 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00303034 A

Priority

DE 19918305 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1046768A2] A lock cylinder (1) has two rotating driving elements coupled together via a spring-mounted latch, one element acting as a sleeve (7) encasing the other forming a core. The coupling can be released by placing a tool in a radial opening (18). The latch is moved back into a latch deflection space. The radial depth is greater than the back-travel of the latch required for disengagement. Several latches can be used operating independently.

[origin: EP1046768A2] The invention relates to a lock cylinder (1) having two driving elements coupled rotatably together, one of which in the form of a sleeve (7) encases the other in the form of a core (6). The two driving elements are coupled to one another by a latch (8) that is arranged in the core (6), is spring-mounted in a radially outward direction with respect to the core, and engages in an opening (9) in the sleeve (7). The coupling is releasable by engagement of a tool in a radial opening (18) arranged in alignment with the latch displacement direction. The latch (8) is arranged to be displaced backwards into a latch deflection space (17). The radial depth of the latch deflection space (17) is greater than the back-travel of the latch (8) required for disengagement. The plurality of latches (8) operate independently of one another and are arranged in a common cross-sectional plane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/00; E05B 3/04; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/04 (2006.01); E05B 27/04 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01); E05B 35/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0649 (2013.01); E05B 3/04 (2013.01); E05B 47/0615 (2013.01); E05B 35/008 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0462 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046768 A2 20001025; EP 1046768 A3 20010207; DE 19918305 A1 20001102; DE 19918305 C2 20010712

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOM SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEWFREY LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EMHART LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 1/00 A, 7E 05B 49/00 B, 7E 05B 3/04 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI