Global patent index - EP 1046777 A1

EP 1046777 A1 2000-10-25 - Finishing strip for roller shutter box

Title (en)

Finishing strip for roller shutter box

Title (de)

Zierleiste für Rolladenkasten

Title (fr)

Profile de finition pour caisson de volet roulant

Publication

EP 1046777 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440098 A

Priority

FR 9905064 A

Abstract (en)

Finishing section is completed by supple application seal (18), with controlled compression, placed on first wing (15) of an (14). Firstly, seal is used to maintain first wing at pre-determined distance (19) from wall (9) of masonry (4) when placing finishing section. Secondly, seal is used with masonry and first wing to define channel (20) for receiving sealant (17).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un profilé de finition pour caisson (5) de volet roulant (1) prenant position au niveau d'une maçonnerie (4) et dont au moins certaines des parois (8, 10) jouxtent, avec un espacement (11), une paroi (9) de la maçonnerie (4), ledit profilé (13), sous forme d'une cornière (14), comportant une première aile (15) s'étendant dans l'espacement (11) ainsi qu'une seconde aile (16) perpendiculaire fixée sur le caisson (5), ladite première aile (15) étant appliquée contre ladite paroi (9) par un mastic d'étanchéité (17). Ce profilé (13) est caractérisé par le fait que, en bordure d'extrémité (22) et du coté (23) orienté vers ladite paroi (9), la première aile (15) comporte un joint d'application souple (18) pour maintenir ladite première aile (15) à une distance (19) prédéfinie de la maçonnerie (4) et pour délimiter, avec cette dernière et ladite première aile (15), une rigole (20) pour l'application du mastic d'étanchéité (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046777 A1 20001025; FR 2792677 A1 20001027; FR 2792677 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031126

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI