Global Patent Index - EP 1046780 A1

EP 1046780 A1 2000-10-25 - Method of enhanced hydrocarbon production by injection of a liquid and gaseous phase at least partially miscible with water

Title (en)

Method of enhanced hydrocarbon production by injection of a liquid and gaseous phase at least partially miscible with water

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Stimulation der Gewinnung von Kohlenwasserstoffen durch Injezierung einer wässrigen und einer gasförmigen Phase, zumindest teilweise mischbar mit Wasser

Title (fr)

Procédé de récupération assistée d'hydrocarbures par injection combinée d'une phase aqueuse et de gaz au moins partiellement miscible à l'eau

Publication

EP 1046780 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400945 A

Priority

FR 9905584 A

Abstract (en)

A permanent control at the wellhead controls the flow rates of the aqueous phase and the gas forming the balancing fluid so gas is saturated or supersaturated at the bottom of the injection shaft The petroleum fluid is recovered by continuous injection into the deposit through an injector (IW) of a balancing fluid mad water with a gas added to it which is at least partially miscible with an aqueous phase and in the petroleum fluid. The balancin fluid is formed by mixing the aqueous phase with the gas at the bottom or the top of the injection shaft. A means of control pla in the shaft is used to increase the rate of dissolution of the gas in the aqueous phase and/or a packing is placed in the injec shaft to ensure the thorough mixing of the gas and the aqueous phase and/or a multi-phase pump is used to mix the gas and the aqueous phase. Data from detectors at the bottom of the shaft are used to control the flow so the gas is saturated. The gas cont an acid gas such as carbon dioxide or hydrogen sulfide. At least one treatment device is used to extract the effluents from the deposit, including at least part of the balancing fluid. At least part of the gaseous effluent from a thermal or chemical unit i used to form at least part of the gas, and the water from the deposit is used as all or part of the aqueous phase. A tensioactiv additive is added to the aqueous phase to improve the gas dispersion and/or an additive is added to the aqueous phase to improve gas solubility. Carbonized water is injected into shafts which are substantially sloped, horizontal or with complex geometry. Th petroleum fluid is recovered using a devious or complex shaft. Each shaft is local to the top of the deposit.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de récupération assistée d'un fluide pétrolier par injection combinée d'une phase aqueuse saturée en gaz acides. Le procédé consiste essentiellement à injecter de manière continue dans le gisement pétrolier un mélange d'une phase aqueuse et de gaz au moins partiellement soluble dans la phase aqueuse et au moins partiellement miscible avec le fluide pétrolier, en contrôlant le rapport des débits de la phase aqueuse et de gaz de telle sorte que celui-ci soit toujours en condition de saturation ou de sursaturation en fond du ou des puits d'injection. La phase aqueuse saturée ou sursaturée en gaz entre en contact avec le fluide pétrolier présent dans le gisement. Le gaz dissous dans la phase aqueuse est transféré au moins en partie à la phase hydrocarbure liquide provoquant le gonflement et la réduction de viscosité de cette phase, ce qui favorise la migration du fluide pétrolier vers une zone de production. Comme gaz, on utilise de préférence des fractions acides d'effluents issus du sous-sol ou d'industries chimiques ou thermiques. Application à la récupération assistée d'hydrocarbures dans des gisements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/16; E21B 43/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/16 (2006.01); E21B 43/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/20 (2013.01); E21B 43/164 (2013.01); Y02P 90/70 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046780 A1 20001025; EP 1046780 B1 20060208; CA 2305946 A1 20001023; DK 1046780 T3 20060410; FR 2792678 A1 20001027; FR 2792678 B1 20010615; NO 20002029 A 20001024; NO 20002029 D0 20000418; US 6325147 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080406

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080406

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080406

2008-12-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060523

2006-04-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT NL

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE

2005-09-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK GB IT NL

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT NL

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI