Global Patent Index - EP 1046784 A1

EP 1046784 A1 2000-10-25 - Cooled structure

Title (en)

Cooled structure

Title (de)

Kühlbares Bauteil

Title (fr)

Structure refroidie

Publication

EP 1046784 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810329 A

Priority

EP 99810329 A

Abstract (en)

For the cooling of a gas turbine component, subject to high temps., the material of the component (141) has an alternating a of blower openings (22) for a coolant (9) and pins (23) with a high thermal conductivity, of metal or diamond, extending out of component on the cooling side (12). The projecting pins are cooled while heat is applied to the zones where the pins are embedde Through the alternating layout with the blower openings, the air flow (7) is ensured around the pins

Abstract (de)

In das zu kühlende Material eines Bauteils (141) werden abwechselnd mit Ausblaseöffnungen (22) für ein Kühlmittel (9) Stifte (23) aus einem Werkstoff mit hoher Wärmeleitfähigkeit eingebracht, dergestalt, dass sie auf der Kühlseite (12) des Bauteils aus dem Bauteil herausragen. Diese Stifte werden in dem Bereich, der aus dem Bauteil herausragt, gekühlt, während ihnen in dem Bereich, der im Bauteil eingebettet ist, Wärme zugeführt wird. Durch die abwechselnde Anordnung mit Ausblaseöffnungen wird die Umströmung (7) der Stifte sichergestellt. Dieser Punkt ist insbesondere dann von Bedeutung, wenn die Stifte in einem engen Spalt angeordnet sind, wie es speziell bei der Kühlung der Hinterkanten von Gasturbinenschaufeln der Fall ist. Die notwendige Anzahl an Ausblaseöffnungen und damit der Kühlmittelverbrauch wird gesenkt <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2260/208 (2013.01); F05D 2260/2214 (2013.01); F05D 2300/131 (2013.01); F05D 2300/141 (2013.01); F05D 2300/224 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046784 A1 20001025; EP 1046784 B1 20040811; DE 59910200 D1 20040916; EP 1445423 A2 20040811; EP 1445423 A3 20040825; EP 1445423 B1 20060802; US 6305904 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910200

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120421

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120421

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910200

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030722

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010407

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI