Global Patent Index - EP 1046788 A1

EP 1046788 A1 2000-10-25 - Nozzle

Title (en)

Nozzle

Title (de)

Diffusor

Title (fr)

Diffuseur

Publication

EP 1046788 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810328 A

Priority

EP 99810328 A

Abstract (en)

The diffuser (1) is within a diffuser housing (4) such as for the steam flow to a turbine in a power station. The diffuser ( and housing (4) are of a ferrite or ferrite-martensite material. A sealing or clamping unit (2) is between the diffuser (1) and housing (4), of a material with a higher coefficient of expansion than the material of the diffuser (1) and housing (4). When th assembly is cold, the seal can be inserted into the gap between the diffuser and housing and, as it heats up the seal expands mo than the surrounding material for an effective seal against leakage. A centering seat (5) ensures that the assembly is fixed horizontally.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Erfindung handelt es sich um einen Diffusor (1), welcher in einem Diffusorgehäuse (4) eingebaut ist und welcher bespielsweise zur Einströmung von Dampf in eine Turbine eines Dampfkraftwerkes eingesetzt wird. Der Diffusor (1) und das Diffusorgehäuse (4) bestehen aus einem ferritischen bzw. ferritischmartensitischen Material. Erfindungsgemäss befindet sich zwischen dem Diffusor (1) und dem Diffusorgehäuse (4) ein dichtendes bzw. verspannendes Element (2,3), welches aus einem Material mit einem grösseren Ausdehnungskoeffizienten als das Material des Diffusors (1) und des Diffusorgehäuses (4) besteht. Der Diffusor (1) kann im kaltem Zustand mit einem Spiel in das Diffusorgehäuse (4) mit dem dichtenden Element eingesetzt werden, durch den grösseren Wärmeausdehnungkoeffizient dehnt das dichtende Element sich mehr aus, sorgt für einen sicheren Halt und vermindert einen Leckageverlust. Auch die Anordnung auf einem Zentriersitz (5) für eine horizontale Fixierung ist möglich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/04 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/047 (2013.01); F01D 25/246 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046788 A1 20001025; EP 1046788 B1 20040804; DE 59910136 D1 20040909

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910136

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910136 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030721

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010421

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI