Global patent index - EP 1046798 A2

EP 1046798 A2 2000-10-25 - Cooling system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cooling system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kühlsystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de refroidissement pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1046798 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890119 A

Priority

AT 71499 A

Abstract (en)

An electrically driven cooling pump (7) feeds a cooling agent through an internal combustion engine (ICE) (1) and a cooler t take out heat. A safety device has an emergency activator (9) and an emergency recognition device (13) designed to detect any trouble near the pump.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Kühlsystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine (1) mit innerer Verbrennung mit einer elektrisch angetriebenen Kühlmittelpumpe (7) zur Förderung eines Kühlmittels durch die Brennkraftmaschine (1) und durch einen Kühler zur Abfuhr der Wärme, wobei eine Sicherheitseinrichtung vorgesehen ist, die eine Notfallerkennungseinrichtung (13) und eine Notfallbetätigungseinrichtung (9) aufweist, wobei die Notfallerkennungseinrichtung (13) dazu ausgebildet ist, einen Störfall im Bereich der elektrisch angetriebenen Kühlmittelpumpe (7) zu erfassen. Eine vergrößerte Zuverlässigkeit wird dadurch erreicht, dass die Notfallbetätigungseinrichtung (9) dazu ausgebildet ist, bei Vorliegen eines Störfalls im Bereich der Kühlmittelpumpe (7) eine mechanische Verbindung der Kühlmittelpumpe (7) mit einem von der Brennkraftmaschine (1) angetriebenen Bauteil (30) zu bewirken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/14 (2006.01); F01P 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/14 (2013.01); F01P 2005/125 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046798 A2 20001025; EP 1046798 A3 20011212; EP 1046798 B1 20051123; DE 50010786 D1 20050825; DE 50011670 D1 20051229; EP 1447540 A1 20040818; EP 1447540 B1 20050720; ES 2242949 T3 20051116; US 6318307 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011670

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080413

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-04-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-04-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-03-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060306

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011670

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI