Global Patent Index - EP 1046802 A2

EP 1046802 A2 2000-10-25 - Method for the controlling of the air/fuel mixture during extreme dynamic variations

Title (en)

Method for the controlling of the air/fuel mixture during extreme dynamic variations

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung des Luft-Kraftstoff-Gemisches bei extremen Dynamikvorgängen

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un mélange air-carburant lors de variations dynamiques extrêmes

Publication

EP 1046802 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106174 A

Priority

DE 19917440 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves deactivating lambda regulation (1) if either there is a high enrichment of the mixture occurs that excee threshold for a certain period (TVUKGBM) or if a high mixture weakening occurs that lies below a threshold for a certain period (TVUKGvM).

Abstract (de)

Damit es nicht zur Beeinträchtigung des Fahrverhaltens aufgrund hoher Ausschläge der Lambdaregelung bei extremen Dynamikvorgängen kommt, wird die Lambdaregelung (1) der Brennkraftmaschine deaktiviert, wenn entweder eine hohe Gemischanreicherung (B_bag) auftritt, welche für eine vorgegebene Zeitdauer (TVUKGBM) eine Schwelle überschreitet, oder wenn eine hohe Gemischabmagerung (B_bag) auftritt, welche für eine vorgegebene Zeitdauer (TVUKGVM) eine Schwelle unterschreitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 41/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1489 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0370091 B1 19910918

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19917440 A1 20001019; DE 19917440 B4 20050324; DE 50011939 D1 20060202; EP 1046802 A2 20001025; EP 1046802 A3 20020731; EP 1046802 B1 20051228; JP 2000310142 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090322

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090321

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090321

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-04-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011939 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI