Global Patent Index - EP 1046803 A2

EP 1046803 A2 2000-10-25 - Method for the operation of an internal-combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for the operation of an internal-combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1046803 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107715 A

Priority

DE 19918565 A

Abstract (en)

The control of a vehicle internal combustion motor (1) has one operation where a fuel mass is injected into the cylinder combustion zone (4) during compression and a second operation where it is injected during suction. On a driver control action through the accelerator pedal which is below a given threshold, on a rotary speed above a given threshold, no further fuel is injected and the ignition is retarded, so that the motor (1) delivers no further torque.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Brennkraftmaschine (1) insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug beschrieben, die mit einem Brennraum (4) versehen ist, in den eine Kraftstoffmasse in einer ersten Betriebsart während einer Verdichtungsphase und in einer zweiten Betriebsart während einer Ansaugphase direkt eingespritzt wird. Eine Zündkerze (10) ist vorgesehen, mit der die eingespritzte Kraftstoffmasse bei einem Zündwinkel entzündet wird. Ein Steuergerät (18) ist zur Steuerung und/oder Regelung der Kraftstoffmasse (mk) und des Zündwinkels in Abhängigkeit von einem über ein Fahrpedal eingebbaren Fahrerwunsch und in Abhängigkeit von der Drehzahl vorgesehen. Bei einem Fahrerwunsch, der kleiner ist als eine vorgegebene Schwelle, und bei einer Drehzahl, die größer ist als eine vorgegebene Schwelle, wird durch das Steuergerät (18) der Zündwinkel danach nach spät verstellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/40; F02D 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 5/15 (2006.01); F02D 31/00 (2006.01); F02D 37/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 31/009 (2013.01); F02D 37/02 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046803 A2 20001025; EP 1046803 A3 20020821; EP 1046803 B1 20061108; DE 19918565 A1 20001026; DE 50013712 D1 20061221; JP 2000314366 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013712

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013712

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100411

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100411

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100411

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070209

2006-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013712 P 20061221

2006-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050518

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02D 41/40 A, 7F 02D 37/02 B, 7F 02P 5/06 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI