Global Patent Index - EP 1046805 A2

EP 1046805 A2 2000-10-25 - Internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1046805 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303319 A

Priority

GB 9909284 A

Abstract (en)

The surfaces of the combustion chambers such as cylinder heads, inlet and outlet valves, piston crowns, and inlet and outlet valve ports are coated with a layer of low thermal mass formed from a combination of thermally conducting and thermally insulating materials. An.

A means of improving the performance of internal combustion engines by coating the surfaces of combustion chambers, such as cylinder heads, inlet and outlet valves, and piston crowns, and inlet and exhaust valve ports with a layer of low thermal mass formed from a suitable combination of thermally conducting and thermally insulating materials. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F02F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/02 (2006.01); F02F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/02 (2013.01); F02F 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046805 A2 20001025; EP 1046805 A3 20010829; GB 9909284 D0 19990616

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030620

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02F 7/00 A, 7F 02F 1/00 B, 7F 02B 77/02 B, 7F 02F 3/12 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI