Global patent index - EP 1046809 A2

EP 1046809 A2 2000-10-25 - Fluid metering device

Title (en)

Fluid metering device

Title (de)

Fluiddosiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dosage d'un fluide

Publication

EP 1046809 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107401 A

Priority

DE 19917839 A

Abstract (en)

A fluid dosing device for a pressurised fluidic medium, includes a pressurised fluid chamber (13) in a housing (1), a valve needle (3) extending through the chamber (13) and having its first end (22) subjected to a stroke action outside the chamber (13 and its second end (23) forming, together with a valve seat (2) positioned on the housing (1), a valve joined to the chamber (13 A metal bellows (17) serves as the lead-in element for the first end (22) of the valve needle (3) from the chamber (13) outwards, in which the external pressure is less than internal chamber (13) pressure, the chamber being tightly hermetically sealed.

Abstract (de)

Die wesentlichen Elemente einer Fluiddosiervorrichtung bzw. eines Hochdruckinjektors sind ein Gehäuse (1), eine darin befindliche unter Fluiddruck stehende Kammer (13) und eine durch die Kammer (13) hindurchgeführte Ventilnadel, deren erstes Ende (22) außerhalb der Kammer (13) mit einem Hub beaufschlagbar ist und deren zweites Ende (23) mit einem am Gehäuse (1) positionierten Ventilsitz ein mit der Kammer (13) in Verbindung stehendes Ventil bildet. Als Durchführungselement für die Ventilnadel (3) an deren erstem Ende (22) wird ein Metallbalg (17) eingesetzt, der hermetisch abdichtet und nur geringe axiale druckbedingte Kräfte erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 61/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 61/167 (2013.01); F02M 63/0057 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046809 A2 20001025; EP 1046809 A3 20030618; EP 1046809 B1 20050810; US 6311950 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100405

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100405

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100405

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090409

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050922

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010902

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02M 51/06 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/08 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/16 B

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI