Global Patent Index - EP 1046811 A1

EP 1046811 A1 2000-10-25 - Electric drive apparatus for internal combustion engines in vehicles

Title (en)

Electric drive apparatus for internal combustion engines in vehicles

Title (de)

Elektrische Antriebsanordnung für Brennkraftmaschinen in Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement électrique de moteurs à combustion interne pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1046811 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103675 A

Priority

DE 19918513 A

Abstract (en)

The drive has an electric starter (11) for coupling to the engine (10) and an electrical generator (12) with a drive couplin the engine and connected to a power supply battery (14) via a semiconducting circuit (13) enabling the generator to be operated generator or as a motor. An electronic controller (15) controls the starting process using the generator operated as a motor wit without the starter depending on the signal from at least one temp. sensor (17,18).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine elektrische Antriebsanordnung für Brennkraftmaschinen (10) in Kraftfahrzeugen vorgeschlagen, mit einem an die Brennkraftmaschine (10) ankoppelbaren elektrischen Anlasser (11) und einem in Antriebsverbindung mit der Brennkraftmaschine (10) stehenden elektrischen Generator (12), der über eine Halbleiterschaltungsanordnung (13) mit einer Versorgungsbatterie (14) verbunden ist, wobei der Generator (12) mittels der Halbleiterschaltungsanrodnung (13) wahlweise generatorisch oder motorisch betreibbar ist. Eine elektronische Steuereinrichtung (15) dient zur Steuerung des Startvorgangs der Brennkraftmaschine (10), wobei dieser Startvorgang in Abhängigkeit des Signals wenigstens eines Temperatursensors (16, 17) mit Hilfe des motorisch betriebenen Generators (12) allein oder zusammen mit dem Anlasser (11) erfolgt. Hierdurch lassen sich schnellere und komfortablere Anlaßvorgänge bei geringeren Schadstoffemissionen erreichen, die auch noch bei sehr tiefen Temperaturen sicher durchführbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/006 (2013.01); F02N 11/04 (2013.01); F02N 19/005 (2013.01); F02N 2019/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046811 A1 20001025; EP 1046811 B1 20030409; DE 19918513 C1 20001102; US 6418899 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI