Global Patent Index - EP 1046813 A1

EP 1046813 A1 2000-10-25 - Engine starter

Title (en)

Engine starter

Title (de)

Anlasser für Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Démarreur de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1046813 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00108397 A

Priority

JP 11710799 A

Abstract (en)

When an engine speed sensor (153) detects that the engine has stopped a control unit (1000) turns a relay RyA (162). When the starter switch is next operated a starter relay control unit (400) turns ON the relay, so the starter motor (171) is driven reversely when a second relay RyB (162a) is turned OFF, and is in the normal direction when this second relay is turned ON. The water temperature is used to determine the length of the warming up period to determine the low region. The OFF state of the starter relay RyA is set according to the engine water temperature. When the degree of warming is large the reverse rotation time is made short and when the degree of warming is small the reverse rotation time is made long.

To improve the startability by reducing the effect of a load upon start-up of an engine. When an Ne sensor (153) detects the stoppage of the engine, a control unit (1000) turns on a relay (RyA). When a starter switch is operated, a starter relay control unit (400) turns on a relay (RyA). The OFF state of the relay (RyB) is kept for a time set on the basis of the water temperature of the engine. When the relay (RyA) is turned on, the starter motor (171) is driven in such a manner as to be reversely rotated when the relay (RyB) is turned off and to be normally rotated when the relay (RyB) is turned on. In this way, the degree of the warming is decided depending on the water temperature, and when the degree of warming is large, the reverse-rotation time of the crank shaft is made short and when the degree of warming is small, the reverse-rotation time of the crank shaft is made long. The crank shaft is reversely rotated for the reverse-rotation time thus set, to be located at a position in a low load region, and is then normally rotated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/00 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02N 15/00 (2006.01); F02N 19/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 19/005 (2013.01); F02N 2019/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046813 A1 20001025; EP 1046813 B1 20021023; CN 1131940 C 20031224; CN 1271813 A 20001101; DE 60000633 D1 20021128; DE 60000633 T2 20030814; JP 2000303938 A 20001031; JP 4076108 B2 20080416; KR 100385850 B1 20030602; TW 476841 B 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000633 20021128

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI