Global Patent Index - EP 1046819 A2

EP 1046819 A2 2000-10-25 - Positive displacement hydraulic machine

Title (en)

Positive displacement hydraulic machine

Title (de)

Hydraulische Verdrängermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine hydraulique volumétrique

Publication

EP 1046819 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108204 A

Priority

DE 19917593 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic displacement machine has the face-side seal of the rotating displacement unit via a pressure plate (42) activa with pressure via a regulating valve (62). With the pressure the size of the sealing gap can be influenced. The regulating valve a hollow piston forming a measurement diaphragm, via which a back flow connection, a connecting leading to a user and a control connection connected hydraulically with the pressure plate are controllable. The displacement machine is preferably formed as a gearwheel machine.

Abstract (de)

Bei der hydraulischen Verdrängermaschine erfolgt die stirnseitige Abdichtung rotierender Verdränger über eine Druckplatte (42). Sie wird über ein Regelventil (62) mit einem Druck beaufschlagt, über den die Größe des Dichtspaltes beeinflußbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß hat das Regelventil (62) einen eine Meßblende ausbildenden Hohlkolben, über den ein Rücklaufanschluß, ein zum Verbraucher führender Anschluß und ein hydraulisch mit der Druckplatte (42) verbundener Steueranschluß ansteuerbar sind. Die Verdrängermaschine wird vorzugsweise als Zahnradmaschine ausgebildet. Das Regelventil zeichnet sich durch einen äußerst kompakten Aufbau aus, so daß das Gehäuse (1) der Verdrängermaschine sehr einfach ausgebildet werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10; F04C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 14/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 14/24 (2013.01); F04C 2/102 (2013.01); Y10T 137/2564 (2015.04); Y10T 137/2567 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1046819 A2 20001025; EP 1046819 A3 20020605; DE 19917593 A1 20001102; DE 19917593 C2 20020502; US 6293777 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021206

2003-04-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI